judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-82-00166-CR
05-82-00166-CR
02/09/1982
Aggravated Robbery
Emmitt Charles Lyons
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/27/1982Brief received - oral argument not requestedPro Se
10/27/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
07/08/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/02/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
02/21/1984Letter issued by the court
05/13/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/22/1983Letter issued by the court
04/20/1983Letter received
11/15/1982Letter issued by the court
10/28/1982Letter received
10/27/1982Brief received - oral argument not requested
10/27/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
10/22/1982Supplemental clerks record filed
09/30/1982Letter issued by the court
09/23/1982Letter received
09/21/1982Reporters record filed
07/26/1982Motion to supplement record filed
07/08/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
06/07/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
05/11/1982Reporters record filed
05/11/1982Clerks record filed
02/09/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/03/1983Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lyons, Emmitt CharlesCriminal - Appellant
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
86th Judicial District Court
Kaufman
Honorable Kaufman District Judge, 86th District Court
13,987
40 Years