judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-82-00069-CR
04-82-00069-CR
02/10/1982
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Hernandez, Mike Lomas
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
04/26/1983Mandate Issued
04/26/1983Mandate Issued
03/02/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/02/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/02/1983No Description Available.
02/02/1983Appeal Reinstated
01/28/1983No Description Available.
08/05/1982No Description Available.
06/23/1982Opinion issuedAbated
06/23/1982Opinion issuedAbated
05/03/1982Motion to Proceed DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/07/1982Motion to Proceed Filed
03/30/1982Motion to Proceed Filed
03/17/1982Motion to Substitute Counsel DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/11/1982Motion to Proceed Filed
02/23/1982Motion to Substitute Counsel Filed
02/10/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/18/1980Record Approved
10/18/1979No Description Available.
07/20/1979Notice of Appeal Filed
07/20/1979Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
144th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable H Frank Garcia
76-CR-1550-A
Fifteen years