Case: 14-21-00289-CV
14-21-00289-CV
05/26/2021
Personal Injury
Bradley K. Weiner M.D.
Patrick Lashford
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/23/2021 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/23/2021 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||
07/23/2021 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
06/23/2021 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
06/17/2021 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||
06/17/2021 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
06/10/2021 | Docketing statement due | | |||||
06/07/2021 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
06/07/2021 | Court fee due | | |||||
06/04/2021 | Reporters record due | | |||||
06/04/2021 | Record due | | |||||
06/03/2021 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
06/01/2021 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
05/27/2021 | Fee paid |
| |||||
05/26/2021 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
05/26/2021 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
05/26/2021 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||||
05/25/2021 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
05/06/2021 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/12/2021 | Status | Appellee brief due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Lashford, Patrick | Appellee | Ryan Teel Stephen W. Stewart Stace Williams |
Weiner, M.D., Bradley K. | Appellant | Grant Martinez Constance H. Pfeiffer Oscar Luis Delarosa Aron Gregg Robles |
Trial Court Information
61st District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge, 61st District Court
2020-18756
Court Reporter, 61st District Court