Case: 05-21-00297-CV
05-21-00297-CV
04/27/2021
Miscellaneous/other civil
EFO GP Interests, Inc. f/k/a EFO Genpar, Inc., EFO Holdings LP, and EFO Laser Spine Institute, Ltd.
James S. St. Louis, et al.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
06/16/2021 | Order issued | Abated |
| ||||
06/03/2021 | Letter filed |
| |||||
05/24/2021 | Response filed |
| |||||
05/24/2021 | Response due | | |||||
05/18/2021 | Order entered | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
05/17/2021 | Response due | | |||||
05/14/2021 | Motion for extension of time to file response filed |
| |||||
05/07/2021 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
05/06/2021 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
05/06/2021 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
05/05/2021 | Fee paid |
| |||||
05/05/2021 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||
05/05/2021 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||
04/28/2021 | No clerks record filed in civil case |
| |||||
04/28/2021 | No reporters record filed in civil case |
| |||||
04/27/2021 | Fee requested |
| |||||
04/27/2021 | Docketing statement due |
| |||||
04/27/2021 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
04/23/2021 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
04/02/2021 | Record due | | |||||
02/01/2021 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/16/2021 | Status | Appeal abated |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
EFO GP Interests, Inc., et al. | Appellant | Christopher J. Schwegmann Gerrit M. Pronske David S. Coale Mark Stromberg |
James S. St. Louis, et al. | Appellee | Hugh Massey Ray III L. James Dickinson |
Trial Court Information
191st Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Gena Slaughter
DC-19-10056
Melba Wright