judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-82-00102-CR
14-82-00102-CR
02/11/1982
Other Drug Sale or Delivery
Polhemus, James Arthur
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/13/1983Mandate Issued
06/09/1983Opinion issuedABATED
05/19/1983Submission
05/05/1983No description available.OTHERWISE DISPOSED
04/29/1983No description available.
03/28/1983Case ready to be set
02/18/1983No description available.
02/14/1983AM CUR, OTHER,
01/14/1983AM CUR, OTHER,
12/30/1982Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
12/21/1982Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/16/1982Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
12/09/1982Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/10/1982Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
11/03/1982Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/12/1982Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
02/11/1982Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/13/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
232nd District Court
Harris
347,151
5 yrs.