judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-82-00070-CR
04-82-00070-CR
02/10/1982
Assault or Attempted Murder
Gutierrez, Ricardo S.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
06/03/1988Mandate Issued
05/18/1988Opinion issuedCt App Rev & Jud Tr Ct Affirmd
04/09/1986Submission
01/15/1986Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Granted
04/19/1985Case Forwarded to Higher Court
04/09/1985Petition for Review Filed
02/28/1985Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
02/28/1985Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
10/19/1984No New Event but Update in Calendar
09/04/1984Submission
09/04/1984Submitted
07/23/1984Case ready to be set
06/11/1984Brief Filed
06/11/1984Case ready to be set
05/30/1984Brief Filed
05/30/1984No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
05/29/1984No Description Available.
05/29/1984No Description Available.
05/29/1984No Description Available.
05/18/1984Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/18/1984Motion for Leave DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/18/1984Order Entered
05/18/1984Appeal Reinstated
05/18/1984Appeal Reinstated
05/17/1984Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
04/23/1984Motion for Leave Filed
04/16/1984Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
12/05/1983No New Event but Update in Calendar
06/20/1983No New Event but Update in Calendar
03/02/1983Opinion issuedAbated
02/10/1982No Description Available.
08/31/1980Waives Oral Argument
07/03/1980Record Approved
03/22/1979Notice of Appeal Filed
03/13/1979Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
227th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Mike M. Machado
78-CR-1089-B
Three (3) years