judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

GUY A. THOMPSON, TRUSTEE, ET AL., MOTOR CARRIERS v. HOVEY PETROLEUM COMPANY, ET AL.

Case: A-2829
A-2829
07/28/1950
Application for Writ of Error
GUY A. THOMPSON, TRUSTEE, ET AL., MOTOR CARRIERS
HOVEY PETROLEUM COMPANY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/13/1950Brief on the MeritsRespondent
09/20/1950Response to Brief filedPetitioner
09/15/1950Supplement to ResponseRespondent
09/12/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
08/14/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
08/07/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
07/28/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/07/1951Opinion issued
11/13/1950Brief on the Merits
10/11/1950Document received (See Remarks)
09/20/1950Response to Brief filed
09/15/1950Supplement to Response
09/12/1950Response to Petition
08/14/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
08/07/1950Response to Petition
07/28/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/28/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hovey Petroleum Company, et al.Respondent
Motor CarriersPetitioner
Guy A. Thompson, Trustee, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information