judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-1929
B-1929
01/13/1970
Application for Writ of Error
DUN AND BRADSTREET, INC.
TRUMAN ONEIL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/10/1970Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/08/1970Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
01/29/1970Response to PetitionRespondent
01/13/1970Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/13/1970Response to Motion filed
07/10/1970Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/24/1970Dissenting opinion issued.
06/24/1970Opinion issued
05/08/1970Supplemental Brief filed
04/01/1970Document received (See Remarks)
02/27/1970Document received (See Remarks)
01/29/1970Response to Petition
01/13/1970Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/13/1970Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Truman ONeilRespondent
Dun and Bradstreet, Inc.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information