judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-81-00823-CR
01-81-00823-CR
01/01/1970
Unknown Civil Case Type.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/21/1982Mandate issued - criminal or civil
07/01/1982Opinion issuedReformed and Affirmed
06/08/1982Motion to extend time to file Supp. SFACTS
04/06/1982Brief filed
03/09/1982Record filed
11/04/1981Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/21/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of Texas
StateCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information