judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

AEON FINANCIAL, LLC V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 10-CV-1114
Short Caption:AEON FINANCIAL, LLC V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Lead: 10-CV-0964 Consolidated: 10-CV-1079 , 10-CV-1080 , 10-CV-1081 , 10-CV-1113 , 10-CV-1114, 10-CV-1115 , 10-CV-1116 , 10-CV-1117 , 10-CV-1119 , 10-CV-1121 , 10-CV-1122 , 10-CV-1123 , 10-CV-1124
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAL1773-09Filed Date:08/27/2010

Opening Event Date:08/27/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/24/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/24/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAeon Financial LLCN
Malik J. TumaNN
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Todd S. KimNY
David A. Bradley NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/27/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/20/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on August 27, 2010, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
09/24/2010RECORD INDEX (ROOM 115A SHELF A2)
09/24/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/27/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
11/10/2010 On consideration of this court's order of September 27, 2010, directing appellant to file the brief and the appendix within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC) elp
12/15/2010 On consideration of appellee's motion to stay appeal in 10-CV-964, pending decision in related matter 09-CV-1330, to which no opposition has been filed, and appellant's unopposed motion in appeal no. 10-CV-1079 for consolidation of appeals no. 10-CV-964, 10-CV-1079, 10-CV-1080, 10-CV-1081, 10-CV-1113, 10-CV-1114, 10-CV-1115, 10-CV-1116, 10-CV-1117, 10-CV-1119, 10-CV-1121, 10-CV-1122, 10-CV- 1123 and 10-CV-1124, and consent motion for leave to stay filing appellant's brief subject to motion to consolidate and appellant's consent motion filed in appeal no. 10-CV-1121 for leave to late file the brief and appendix, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion to consolidate is granted and appeals no. 10-CV-964, 10-CV-1079, 10-CV-1080, 10-CV-1081, 10-CV-113, 10-CV-1114, 10-CV-1115, 10-CV-1116, 10-CV-1117, 10-CV-1119, 10-CV-1121, 10-CV-1122, 10-CV-1123 and 10-CV-1124 are consolidated for all purposes herein. It is (MORE)
12/15/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's motion for leave is granted to the extent that the Clerk shall file the lodged brief and appendix in these consolidated cases. It is (MORE)
12/15/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF (FILED UNDER 10-CV-1121)(Aplt's Brief & 1 box of Appdx. in 115A shelf C1)
12/15/2010APPENDIX
12/15/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's motion to stay filing of brief subject to consolidation as denied as moot. It is (MORE)
12/15/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that appellee's motion to stay is granted to the extent that these consolidated matters are hereby stayed pending a decision in related matter 09-CV-1330. (ETW) elp
12/15/2010CASE STAYED
12/15/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte vacating the stay entered by this court on December 15, 2010, and directing appelleee's brief within 30 days
12/15/2011FiledProceed With Appeal; No Longer On Hold/Stayed
01/05/2012FiledMotion To Remand for further proceedings (Appellee)Granted
01/13/2012FiledOpposition to motion of aple, D.C. to remand for further proceeding (Appellant)
01/23/2012FiledReply to oppo to motion to remand for further proceedings (Appellee)
01/24/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion To Remand for further proceedings (Appellee)
01/24/2012FiledDismissed
01/24/2012FiledMandate