judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HALE VS. CONQUY

Case Information: 33395
Short Caption:HALE VS. CONQUYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A361855Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/15/1999 / Zucker, CarolSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:11/16/2000 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:11/16/2000How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/25/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Rawlings, Olson, Cannon, Gormley & Desruisseaux--check no. 040319.
11/25/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00175
12/07/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Daniel Marks. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
12/28/1998Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. From Settlement Judge Daniel Marks. Conference is scheduled for January 25, 1999. 98-00522
01/07/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Letter from Settlement Judge Daniel Marks. He is recusing himself from this matter. 99-00084
01/15/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. New Settlement Judge: Carol Zucker.
01/19/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against counsel for appellant. 99-00332
01/29/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00638
05/13/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-03919
06/04/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nevertheless, the briefing and request for transcripts shall remain suspended pending a jurisdictional review and further order of this court. 99-04674
06/21/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to comply with the provisions of NRAP 9(a) and 120 days to file and serve te opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 99-05341
10/21/1999MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: November 19, 1999. 99-10307
11/22/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 11/19/99. 99-11680
12/21/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: January 21, 2000. 99-12965
01/21/2000MotionFiled Stipulation. (Second Request) 00-00971
01/24/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. On January 21, 2000, the parties filed a second stipualtion for an extension of time to file the answering brief. The stipulation is treated as an unopposed motion for an extension of time. The answering brief shall be served and filed within 10 days from the date of this order. 00-01126
01/31/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Fed-Ex 1/28/00. 00-01522
02/28/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: March 29, 2000. 00-03116
03/31/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 3/29/00. 00-05254
10/09/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on November 16, 2000 at 11:30 a.m. in Las Vegas. (SNP00A-1 - CY/RR/NB)
11/02/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
11/16/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. SNP00A-WM/RR/NB.
12/08/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having concluded that Dr. hale's argument on appeal lacks merit, we "AFFIRM the order of the district court." SNP00A-1-RR/WM/NB 00-21452
12/22/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. G. Dallas Horton hereby agrees to the substitution of Anastasia L. Noe as attorney for Respondents, Ione D. Conquy and Kevin Conquy. 00-22359
12/28/2000Other Other. Mailed copy of Order of Affirmance filed 12/08/00 to Anastasioa L. Noe (Counsel for Respondents Conquy).
01/03/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-21748
01/03/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/20/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 9, 2001. 00-21748