judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STEVEN PAUL MUNOZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0238)
Case Number:S-07-0238Case Docketed On:10/17/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:STEVEN PAUL MUNOZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:STEVEN PAUL MUNOZ, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSteven Paul MunozDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
D. Michael Pauling
Terry L. Armitage

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/17/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/17/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/04/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/04/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/14/2008Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/14/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/15/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/15/2008Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
02/19/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal with original waiver attached.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/19/2008Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
02/19/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal