Case: 94-0001
94-0001
01/03/1994
See former TRAP 130(D)
ROBERT F. GIRDLEY, SR. and VIRGINIA GIRDLEY
SOUTHWESTERN BELL YELLOW PAGES, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/28/1994 | Reply to Response | Respondent | | |
02/14/1994 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/02/1994 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | No Mo/Re filed | | |
03/30/1994 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied with Justice not sitting. | W/Justice Spector not sitting. | |
03/03/1994 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
02/28/1994 | Reply to Response | | | |
02/14/1994 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | | |
01/05/1994 | APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ERROR IS DUE TO BE FILED | App due 01-20-94 | | |
01/05/1994 | Extension of time to file app writ err disposed of | Filing granted | M/E/T granted app due 01/20/94 | |
01/03/1994 | Extension of time to file app writ err filed | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
05/02/1994 | Case Stored | Case stored. | No Mo/Re filed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
SOUTHWESTERN BELL YELLOW PAGES | Respondent | Mr. Stuart R. Schwartz Mr. Jeffrey S. Alley |
GIRDLEY, VIRGINIA | Petitioner | Ms. Carolyn Findley Price |
GIRDLEY, SR., ROBERT F. | Petitioner | Ms. Carolyn Findley Price |
Court of Appeals Information:
08-93-00213-CV
Dismissed WOJ
869 SW2d 409, 09-29-93
8th Court of Appeals
Honorable RICHARD BARAJAS
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 2
El Paso
Honorable John L. Fashing
88-0174