judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-82-00127-CR
01-82-00127-CR
01/01/1970
Unknown Civil Case Type.
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/18/1985Mandate issued - criminal or civil
11/29/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/07/1984Submitted
12/30/1983Submission
12/16/1983Brief filed
12/01/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
11/15/1983Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
10/20/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
10/07/1983Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
09/16/1983Brief filed
08/25/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
08/15/1983Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
08/03/1983Record filed
05/25/1982Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/18/1985Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of Texas
StateCriminal - Appellant
StateCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information