Case: 08-94-00004-CR
08-94-00004-CR
01/05/1994
Criminal Habeas Corpus
Gonzalez, Emil Andre
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
09/21/1994 | Mandate Issued | | |
09/21/1994 | Shuck purged | | |
09/21/1994 | Mandate Issued | | |
07/21/1994 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
07/21/1994 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
06/30/1994 | Submitted | | |
06/30/1994 | Submission | | |
06/30/1994 | Submitted | | |
06/15/1994 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/15/1994 | Submission | | |
06/13/1994 | Miscellaneous Motion Filed | | |
05/31/1994 | Brief Filed | | |
05/31/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
05/31/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
05/12/1994 | Brief Filed | | |
04/28/1994 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/22/1994 | Amended Motion Filed to Correct Original Motion | | |
04/13/1994 | Miscellaneous filing | | |
04/13/1994 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
03/30/1994 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/30/1994 | Motion to supplement disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/30/1994 | Sup. St. of Facts Filed | | |
03/15/1994 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
03/15/1994 | Motion to supplement filed | | |
03/07/1994 | Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry | | |
02/09/1994 | Motion for Ext Transcript Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/09/1994 | Motion for Extension Statement of Facts Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/09/1994 | Order entered | | |
02/09/1994 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
02/09/1994 | Transcript Filed | | |
02/02/1994 | Amended Motion Filed to Correct Original Motion | | |
02/02/1994 | Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed | | |
01/26/1994 | Motion postponed, to be heard later | | |
01/12/1994 | Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed | | |
01/05/1994 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
01/05/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/21/1994 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
GONZALES, EMIL ANDRE | Criminal - Appellant | Hon. David L. Botsford Hon. Robert R. Harris |
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Jaime E. Esparza |
Trial Court Information
41st District Court
El Paso
71917
Order denying writ