judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-1940
B-1940
01/20/1970
Application for Writ of Error
ROBERT LANDRY, JR.
TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/13/1970Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/04/1970Response to PetitionRespondent
01/20/1970Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/07/1970Dissenting opinion issued.
08/13/1970Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/29/1970Opinion issued
02/18/1970Document received (See Remarks)
02/18/1970Document received (See Remarks)
02/18/1970Document received (See Remarks)
02/04/1970Response to Petition
01/20/1970Document received (See Remarks)
01/20/1970Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANYRespondent
Robert Landry, Jr.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information