judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-1943
B-1943
01/22/1970
Application for Writ of Error
GRACE M. POWER
MRS. THELMA POWER LANDRUM, ET AL., ROBERT EDWARD POWER, JOHN GERALD POWER, JR., KATHLEEN POWER CHILDS, RICHARD CHILDS AND TEXAS NATIONAL BANK OF COMMERCE OF HOUSTON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/14/1971Motion for RehearingRespondent
01/14/1971Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/10/1970Reply to ResponsePetitioner
10/29/1970Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/05/1970Response to PetitionRespondent
01/30/1970Response to PetitionRespondent
01/22/1970Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/20/1971Response to Motion filed
01/14/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/14/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/31/1970Opinion issued
11/10/1970Reply to Response
11/03/1970Response to Motion filed
10/29/1970Motion for RehearingFiling granted
04/01/1970Document received (See Remarks)
04/01/1970Document received (See Remarks)
04/01/1970Document received (See Remarks)
04/01/1970Document received (See Remarks)
02/05/1970Response to Petition
01/30/1970Response to Petition
01/22/1970Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/22/1970Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mrs. Thelma Power Landrum, et al.Respondent
Robert Edward Power, John Gerald Power, Jr., Kathleen Power Childs, Richard Childs and Texas National Bank of Commerce of HoustonRespondent
Grace M. PowerPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information