judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ASSICURAZIONI GENERALI VS. TANNER

Case Information: 33378
Short Caption:ASSICURAZIONI GENERALI VS. TANNERCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A382174Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:11/25/1998 / Crockett, JamesSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/20/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Beckley, Singleton firm--check no. 68113.
11/20/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00129
11/25/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: James R. Crockett, Jr. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
12/04/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 98-00255
12/23/1998Filing Fee Returned Filing Fee. Check No. 68726 returned to Beckley, Singleton firm. No fee due for amended notice of appeal.
12/23/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. 98-00491
01/08/1999Notice/Outgoing Letter.
08/05/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-07207
09/14/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nevertheless, the briefing and request for transcripts shall remain suspended pending a jurisdictional review and further order of this court. 99-08643
09/30/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The briefing schedule and ordering of transcripts in this appeal shall remain suspended pending further order of this court. 99-09357
11/03/1999MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 99-10750
11/03/1999MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 99-10751
11/18/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, we "ORDER this appeal dismissed."NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 99-11494
11/18/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.