judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KEDIST HIRPASSA V. SECURITAS SECURITY

Case Information: 10-CV-1094
Short Caption:KEDIST HIRPASSA V. SECURITAS SECURITYClassification:Appeals - Civil - Contracts
Lead: 10-CV-1085 Consolidated:10-CV-1094, 10-CV-1095
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB7948-08Filed Date:08/25/2010

Opening Event Date:08/25/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/04/2010
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKedist Hirpassa YPro SeN
AppelleeSecuritas SecurityNPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/25/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/14/2010 ORDERED, SS, that APPEAL NOS. 10CV1085, 10CV1094 and 10CV1095 are hereby CONSOLIDATED for all purposes. It is ****MORE*****
09/14/2010 ORDERED that appellant shall, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been taken from a NON-APPEALABLE ORDER. See DC Code 11-721 (2001). (BY: ETW)
09/14/2010TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
09/27/2010APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to change name
10/04/2010RECEIVED - aplt's motion to change name. duplicate motion filed
10/13/2010 ORDERED that THESE APPEALS ARE HEREBY DISMISSED as having been taken from NON-APPEALABLE ORDERS. (RDPRTE) (jl)
10/13/2010DISMISSED
11/04/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived