judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

DR. ALFRED GARZA v. ALLIED DEER PARK BANK

Case: C-8481
C-8481
03/17/1989
App Writ of Error
DR. ALFRED GARZA
ALLIED DEER PARK BANK
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Remarks Document
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
03/20/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent
03/17/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Remarks Document
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
11/09/1989Record returned to Court of AppealsNO REHEARING FILED
10/18/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
03/22/1989Case forwarded to Court
03/22/1989No description available.
03/20/1989Reply to Response
03/17/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
11/09/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
01-87-00584-CV
AFF/REV/REN/REM
Rule 90, 12-29-88
1st Court of Appeals
Honorable Ben G. Levy
Trial Court Information
281st District Court
Harris
Honorable Louis M. Moore
84-57670