Case: 04-19-00898-CR
04-19-00898-CR
12/31/2019
Poss of a Controlled Substance
Adrian Justino Soto
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/26/2020 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | State |
| ||||
07/30/2020 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/04/2020 | Submitted | | |||||
09/29/2020 | Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied |
| |||||
08/27/2020 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
08/26/2020 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
08/19/2020 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||
07/30/2020 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||
07/17/2020 | Order entered |
| |||||
07/17/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
06/30/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
04/03/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion |
| ||||
04/02/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
02/28/2020 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
02/25/2020 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
02/24/2020 | No reporters record filed in criminal case |
| |||||
02/24/2020 | No reporters record filed in criminal case |
| |||||
01/31/2020 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
01/30/2020 | Motion to withdraw attorney disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
01/30/2020 | Order entered |
| |||||
01/29/2020 | Prescreened | | |||||
01/28/2020 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
01/23/2020 | Letter filed |
| |||||
01/11/2020 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
01/03/2020 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||
01/03/2020 | Motion to withdraw attorney filed |
| |||||
12/31/2019 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
12/31/2019 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||
12/09/2019 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | | |||||
12/09/2019 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/04/2020 | Submitted | Submitted on briefs |
12/31/2019 | Status | Pending action of court |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Andrew Warthen Joe D. Gonzales |
Soto, Adrian Justino | Appellant | Angela J. Moore |
Trial Court Information
290th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Jennifer Pena
2018CR4647
Geneva Garcia