judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-81-00552-CR
14-81-00552-CR
08/12/1981
Robbery
Wilson, Ronnie Earl
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/12/1984Mandate Issued
11/12/1984Record RETURNED from Higher Court
10/17/1984Petition for Discretionary ReviewDENIED
06/01/1984Petition for Discretionary Review
05/07/1984Petition for Discretionary Review
04/05/1984Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
03/29/1984Submission
09/21/1983AM CUR, OTHER,
09/01/1983AM CUR, OTHER,
08/04/1983Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
07/22/1983Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
07/14/1983No description available.DENIED
07/01/1983No description available.
06/23/1983Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
06/23/1983No description available.DENIED
06/15/1983Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA
06/09/1983Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
06/09/1983Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA
05/31/1983Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
05/04/1983No description available.
03/10/1983Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAGRANTED
02/10/1983Opinion issuedREVERSED
10/12/1982Petition for Discretionary Review
09/09/1982Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAOVERRULED
08/13/1982No description available.
07/16/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
04/01/1982Order Entered
03/23/1982Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
03/18/1982Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
01/09/1982Record Filed (Both records FILED)
08/12/1980Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/12/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasCalvin A. Hartmann
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantMichael B. Charlton
Trial Court Information
182nd District Court
Harris
315,020
10 yrs. TDC