Case: C-7221
C-7221
02/12/1988
App Writ of Error
CAVALIER CORPORATION d/b/a GRAFF VENDING COMPANY
STORE ENTERPRISES INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/24/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
02/29/1988 | Reply to Response | Respondent | | |
02/12/1988 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/24/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
04/17/1989 | Cost letter issued | | | |
04/29/1988 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | NO MOTION FOR REHEARING FILED | | |
04/06/1988 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied | | |
03/02/1988 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
03/02/1988 | No description available. | | | |
02/29/1988 | Reply to Response | | | |
02/18/1988 | Cost letter issued | DIRECTED TO 5TH COA (SEE FILE) | | |
02/12/1988 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
04/29/1988 | Case Stored | Case stored. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-87-01013-CV
Dismissed [duplicate 1]
742 SW2d 785, 12-01-87
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
162nd District Court
Dallas
Honorable Catherine J. Crier
85-13528-I