judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DONNELL DAVID HAWKINS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1104
Short Caption:DONNELL DAVID HAWKINS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM1111-10Filed Date:08/25/2010

Opening Event Date:08/25/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/04/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/05/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDonnell David Hawkins Y
Deborah A. PersicoYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/25/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/14/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Deborah Persico, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. For the Court, Julio A. Castillo, Clerk (dfe)
09/14/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Deborah Persico, Esquire
09/23/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
01/04/2011RECORD INDEX
01/04/2011RECORD COPIES
01/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (64pgs/White) 8/9/10 proc.
01/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (88pgs/White) 8/10/10 proc. w/CD
01/04/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/07/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (CASTILLO)
02/11/2011COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS) w/brief and appedix. Granted
02/22/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL NO LATER THAN MARCH 16, 2011, FILE ANY RESPONSE showing with specificity any reason why counsel's motion should not be granted and the conviction, order or judgment on appeal affirmed...SEE HARDCOPY It is FURTHER ORDERED that the MOTION OF COURT-APPOINTED COUNSEL TO WITHDRAW is HEREBY HELD IN ABEYANCE pending appellant's response to this order. (BY: ETW)
02/22/2011TMC - motion to withdaw (ANDERS)
04/13/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION TO WITHDRAW pursuant to ANDERS v. CALIFORNIA... IS GRANTED. The government presented sufficient evidence to establish two convictions of simple assault and destruction of property... It is ****MORE*****
04/13/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal be and IS AFFIRMED. (THKNBE)
05/05/2011MANDATE ISSUED