judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JANEEN L. CAPSHAW, TRUSTEE FOR JANEEN L. CAPSHAW-KING REVOCABLE TRUST v. JOY L. OSBON, Successor Trustee of the Zelda Corbett Revocable Trust dated the 3rd day of November, 1993, as amended and MATHEW TODD CORBETT

Case Heading (S-07-0228)
Case Number:S-07-0228Case Docketed On:10/01/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Washakie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:JANEEN L. CAPSHAW, TRUSTEE FOR JANEEN L. CAPSHAW-KING REVOCABLE TRUST v. JOY L. OSBON, Successor Trustee of the Zelda Corbett Revocable Trust dated the 3rd day of November, 1993, as amended and MATHEW TODD CORBETT
Full Title:JANEEN L. CAPSHAW, TRUSTEE FOR JANEEN L. CAPSHAW-KING REVOCABLE TRUST, Appellant (Intervenor), v. JOY L. OSBON, Successor Trustee of the Zelda Corbett Revocable Trust dated the 3rd day of November, 1993, as amended, Appellee (Plaintiff), and MATHEW TODD CORBETT, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJaneen L. CapshawGary R. Scott
Billie LM Addleman
AppelleeJoy L. OsbonMary Helen Reed
AppelleeMathew Todd CorbettJohn P. Worrall

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Other, Property
Opinion Number:2008 WY 95
Citation:190 P.3d 156

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/01/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/01/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/01/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/01/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/30/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/31/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/27/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on cd; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
01/09/2008Brief - Appellee Joy L. Osbon, Successor Trustee; received copy of designation of recordBriefAppelleeFinal
01/11/2008Motion - Extension of time - brief (and request to file a separate brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/11/2008Motion - Strike certain portions of appellee Joy L. Osbon's Reply (sic) briefMotionStrikeFinal
01/14/2008Brief - Appellee CorbettBriefAppelleeFinal
01/22/2008Response/Objection - Motion to strike portions of appellee's briefResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
01/29/2008Notice-Incoming - Errata to reply brief of appellant.Notice-IncomingErrataFinal
02/05/2008Order - Striking portion of appellee Joy L. Osbon's briefOrderStrikingFinal
02/05/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/11/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/11/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
02/25/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/29/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - John Worrall for appellee Corbett.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/04/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Billie Addleman for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/21/2008Stipulation - Other - to waive oral argument and submit on briefs.StipulationOtherFinal
03/21/2008Order - Vacating oral argument and assigning to expedited docketOrderVacating oral argument and assigning to brief only docketFinal
08/15/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/03/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/03/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/03/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/03/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/08/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 9/5/08 by Suzann Whitlock.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal