judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Atlas Survival Shelters, LLC v. Clyde Scott and Rising S Company, LLC

Case: 12-20-00054-CV
12-20-00054-CV
02/19/2020
Injunction
Atlas Survival Shelters, LLC
Clyde Scott and Rising S Company, LLC
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
05/07/2020Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
04/09/2020Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
04/01/2020Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
01/29/2021Case stored
01/29/2021Mandate issued
01/04/2021Petition for review was not filed
12/03/2020Motion for rehearing was not filed
11/18/2020Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
10/09/2020Internal memo
10/09/2020Telephone inquiry to or from the court
05/20/2020Submitted
05/07/2020Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested
05/07/2020Case ready to be set
05/06/2020Original exhibits filed
04/29/2020Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied
04/17/2020Electronic Motion for extension of time to file brief dispMotion or Writ Granted
04/17/2020Motion to dismiss disposedOverruled
04/14/2020Response filed
04/13/2020Electronic Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
04/13/2020Response requested by the court
04/13/2020Prescreened
04/09/2020Motion to dismiss filed
04/09/2020Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested
04/01/2020Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested
03/13/2020Electronic Clerks Record Filed
03/11/2020Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
03/05/2020Letter filed
03/04/2020Extension of time to file clerks record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/04/2020No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record
03/03/2020Extension of time to file clerks record filed
02/26/2020Amended notice of appeal filed
02/25/2020Docketing statement filed
02/19/2020Letter requesting attorney to comply on payment and/or designation of record
02/19/2020Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/19/2020Extension of time to file reporters record filed
02/19/2020Notice of late record
02/19/2020Notice of defect regarding perfection of the notice of appeal
02/19/2020Letter issued by the court
02/19/2020Court packet sent to parties
02/19/2020Fee paid
02/19/2020Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
10/22/2019Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court
10/22/2019Notice of appeal filed in trial court
10/15/2019Order enteredMotion or Writ Denied
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/29/2021Case StoredCase stored
01/29/2027RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Scott, ClydeAppelleeMr. Zachary Cate
Ms. Misty M. Pratt
Atlas Survival Shelters, LLCAppellantMr. Matthew Holz
Mr. Lee Warren
Mr. Nate Smith
Mr. Philip N. Smith
Rising S Company, LLCAppelleeMs. Misty M. Pratt
Mr. Zachary Cate
Trial Court Information
294th District Court
Van Zandt
Honorable Chris B. Martin
19-00111
Estella T. Grisham