judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-81-00538-CR
01-81-00538-CR
08/19/1981
Robbery
Sanders, Henry L.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/12/1984Mandate issued - criminal or civil
05/21/1984Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
04/25/1984No description available.Refused
01/11/1984No description available.
12/16/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/16/1983Record filed
04/02/1983Supplemental brief filed
03/30/1982Record filed
03/09/1982Brief filed
02/16/1982Brief filed
08/19/1981Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/12/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - Appellant
StateCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
209th District Court
Harris
Honorable Frank C. Price
335,873
7 Years