judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TAYLOR VS. SCHOPEN

Case Information: 33384
Short Caption:TAYLOR VS. SCHOPENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9601365Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/04/1998 / Munnell, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:10/10/2000 at 9:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:10/10/2000How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/20/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Perry & Spann--check no. 0040135.
11/20/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00141
12/04/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William Munnell. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
12/07/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: October 27, 1998 Order and July 14, 1997 Order. To Court Reporter: No court reporter listed. 98-00270
12/07/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 98-00271
12/29/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk shall strike the transcript request form filed on Decemer 7, 1998, forthwith. In the event this matter does no settle, this court will reinstate the time period for requesting and prpearing the transcript. 98-00545
01/25/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-00513
02/09/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Notices of Entry for orders filed 7/14/97 and 10/27/98. Due Date: 10 days
02/12/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nevertheless, the briefing and request for transcripts shall remain suspended pending a jurisdictional review and further order of this court. 99-01011
02/17/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Filed in district court on:11/2/98. 99-01055
02/23/1999Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. Appellants: 15 days from the date of this order to comply with the provisions of NRAP 9(a) and 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 99-01230
03/10/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 10/27/98 and 7/14/97. To Court Reporter: Isolde Zihn. 99-01703
04/23/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit. Affidavit with Respect to Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 99-03202
06/21/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: 7/23/99. 99-06689
07/23/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: UPS 7/22/99. 99-06688
07/23/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1 and 2. 99-06690
08/24/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: September 13, 1999. 99-07896
09/13/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent Bernard A. Schopen's Answering Brief. Mailed on: Reno/Carson Msgr. 9/13/99. 99-08617
09/14/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent, City of Reno's Answering Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 9/14/99. 99-08632
09/14/1999MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation to Amend Caption. 99-08666
09/14/1999MotionFiled Stipulation. 99-08682
09/16/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Approving Stipulation. The clerk shall amend the caption to correct the spelling of respondent Shopen's last name from "Shopen" to it's correct spelling, "Schopen". 99-08761
09/16/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. On September 14, 1999 the parties filed a stipulation for an extension of time to file the answering brief. The answering brief having been filed on September 14, 1999, the stipualtion is disapproved as moot. 99-08762
08/28/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on October 10, 2000 at 9:00 a.m. in Carson City. (NNP00A-MS/DA/ML)
09/21/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
10/10/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Northern Nevada Panel: NNP00A-MS/DA/ML.
12/29/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. " . . . we affirm the order of summary judgment for Schopen, but reverse the order of summary judgment for the City and we remand that case for further proceedings, consistent with this order." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-22665
01/24/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-22749
01/24/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/20/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 26, 2001. 00-22749