judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANDRE ANTOINE FISHER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1103
Short Caption:ANDRE ANTOINE FISHER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Carjacking
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-23756-09Filed Date:08/30/2010

Opening Event Date:08/30/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/29/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/31/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/27/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/10/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAndre Antoine Fisher Y
Craig N. MooreYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Sean M. Lewis YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/30/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/16/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Craig N. Moore, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
09/16/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Craig N. Moore, Esquire
10/18/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ORDERED/NEEDED (pii))
12/29/2010RECORD INDEX
12/29/2010RECORD COPIES
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (SEALED pleadings)
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (65 pgs/Walker) 3/29/10 proc. a.m.
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (65 pgs/Hunt) 3/29/10 proc. p.m.
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (75 pgs/Geddes) 4/12/10 proc.
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (75 pgs/Rogers) 4/13/10 proc.
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (227 pgs/Geddes) 4/14/10 proc.
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (196 pgs/Richer) 4/21/10 proc.
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (9 pgs/Maar) 4/22/10 proc.
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (4 pgs/tape) 7/19/10 proc.
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (15 pgs/tape) 8/11/10 proc. w/cd
12/29/2010RECORD COMPLETED
02/17/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
03/14/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 90 days (unopposed)
03/17/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 27, 2011. (JAC)
06/27/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 30 days (unopposed)
07/14/2011FiledOn consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before July 27, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (pii)
07/27/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
07/27/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
08/31/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
08/31/2011FiledBriefing Completed
10/17/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/06/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/27/2012FiledArgued Before Blackburne-Rigsby,Beckwith,Belson Craig N.Moore esq.,for appellant Sean M. Lewis Esq.,for appellee
06/27/2012LodgedLetter From appellant seeking assistance with obtaining trial court exhibits. (Appellant)
07/23/2012FiledLetter To Craig N. Moore, Esq. re: Andre Fisher's request for exhibits
08/10/2012FiledLetter From Counsel regarding Attorney-Client corrospondence. (Appellant)
08/16/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Beckwith, Associate Judges, and Belson, Senior Judge.)
09/10/2012FiledMandate
11/14/2012FiledLetter From appellant requesting to file a Motion to Recall the Mandate (Appellant)
11/30/2012FiledLetter From appellant requesting trial exhibits (Appellant)