judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

REBECCA J. LUHM v. BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF HOT SPRINGS COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 1

Case Heading (S-07-0227)
Case Number:S-07-0227Case Docketed On:09/28/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Hot Springs CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Education (Title 21)
Short Title:REBECCA J. LUHM v. BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF HOT SPRINGS COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 1
Full Title:REBECCA J. LUHM, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF HOT SPRINGS COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 1, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRebecca J. LuhmErin Maureen Kendall
Patrick E. Hacker
Gregory Patrick Hacker
AppelleeBoard of Trustees of Hot Springs County School District No. 1Tracy J. Copenhaver

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Employment Law
Opinion Number:2009 WY 63
Citation:206 P.3d 1290

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/28/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/28/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/28/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/28/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/13/2007Brief - Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
12/18/2007Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/03/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
01/07/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/10/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, three volumes, Original PapersRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/10/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
01/17/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/25/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgments - oral argument setting - Patrick Hacker for appellant; Tracy Copenhaver for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/05/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Patrick E. Hacker for appellant; Tracy J. Copenhaver for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/05/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/12/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the Court. Justice Hill filed a dissenting opinion in which Justice Kite joinedOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/28/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/28/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/28/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/28/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/01/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 5/29/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal