Case: 01-88-00120-CR
01-88-00120-CR
02/10/1988
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Escobedo, Mario Alberto
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
04/30/1990 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
04/30/1990 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
03/13/1990 | Case file returned from higher Court or agency. | | |
02/14/1990 | Petition for discretionary review disposed | Refused | |
11/30/1989 | Case file received by higher Court or agency. | | |
11/29/1989 | Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency | | |
11/20/1989 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed | | |
11/03/1989 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |
10/19/1989 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
10/19/1989 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
10/03/1989 | Submitted | | |
10/03/1989 | Submission | | |
10/03/1989 | Submitted | | |
07/20/1989 | Submission | | |
06/01/1989 | Brief filed-oral argument has been waived | | |
06/01/1989 | Case ready to be set | | |
06/01/1989 | Case ready to be set | | |
05/18/1989 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
05/05/1989 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
04/10/1989 | Brief filed-oral argument has been waived | | |
03/06/1989 | Supplemental transcript filed | | |
12/22/1988 | Order entered | Order trial court hearing-no brief filed | |
11/17/1988 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
11/08/1988 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
11/01/1988 | Brief due for retained counsel | | |
10/06/1988 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
09/28/1988 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
08/04/1988 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
07/27/1988 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
07/19/1988 | Brief due for retained counsel | | |
06/13/1988 | Statement of facts filed | | |
05/26/1988 | Motion to extend time to file state of facts disp | Grant motion | |
05/18/1988 | Motion to extend time to file statement of facts | | |
04/14/1988 | Motion to extend time to file state of facts disp | Grant motion | |
04/05/1988 | Motion to extend time to file statement of facts | | |
03/30/1988 | Transcript filed | | |
02/10/1988 | Notice of appeal filed | | |
02/10/1988 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/30/1990 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State | Criminal - Appellant | Gilbert Villarreal |
State | Criminal - State of Texas | John B. Holmes |
State | Criminal - State of Texas | J. Harvey Hudson |
Trial Court Information
182nd District Court
Harris
475,942
life