Case: PD-0934-87
PD-0934-87
09/03/1987
PDR Case Type
THORNTON, RICHARD EARL
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
12/02/1987 | FINAL DISP/REHEAR | Refused | |
12/02/1987 | REHEAR DISP | DENIED | |
11/06/1987 | REHEAR FILED | | |
10/21/1987 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
10/06/1987 | NO RESPONSE FILED | | |
09/03/1987 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/02/1987 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
STATE OF TEXAS | State | John Holmes |
THORNTON, RICHARD EARL | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | Paul Tatum |
Court of Appeals Information:
01-84-00463-CR
Aff 6-18-87
1st Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
176th District Court
Harris
Honorable WILLIAM M. HATTEN
390,555