judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MACK VS. ASHLOCK-DUGAN

Case Information: 34735
Short Caption:MACK VS. ASHLOCK-DUGANCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - DV91256Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/10/1999 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/26/1999MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Motion for Emergency Stay Pending Appeal. 99-08007
08/26/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
08/27/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Silverman & Decaria--check no. 15950.
08/27/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08065
09/02/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion for Emergency Stay Pending Appeal. 99-08281
09/03/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Index to Appendix to Opposition to Motion for Emergency Stay Pending Appeal. 99-08311
09/08/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: July 14, 1999 and July 15, 1999. To Court Reporter: Susan Kigar, Molezzo Court Reporters. 99-08429
09/09/1999MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Permission to File Reply Regarding Motion for Emergency Stay Pending Appeal. 99-08509
09/09/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. July 14, 1999 and July 15, 1999 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Susan C. Kiger. 99-08511
09/10/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/13/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to File Docketing Statement. 99-08622
09/16/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Judgment filed 8/16/99. Due Date: 10 days
10/07/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. fn1[On August 26, 1999, appellant filed a motion for a stay. On September 2, 1999, respondent filed an opposition to that motion, in which respondent suggested that this court lacked jurisdiciton over the appeal. On September 9, 1999, appellant moved to file a reply, and tendered a reply. We conclude that issuing an order to show cause under these circumstances is unnecessary, as jurisdiction has been addressed. We direct the clerk of this court to file the reply, which was received on September 9, 1999]. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn3[We decline appellant's invitation to treat this appeal as a writ for extrordinary relief. In light of this order, we deny the motion for a stay as moot]. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 99-09634
10/07/1999MotionFiled Reply to Response. Reply in Support of Motion for emergency Stay Pending Appeal. 99-08510
11/02/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-10664
11/02/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/08/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 3, 1999. 99-10664