judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARK A. DORR v. THE WYOMING BOARD OF CERTIFIED PUBLIC ACCOUNTANTS

Case Heading (06-12)
Case Number:06-12Case Docketed On:01/10/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Professions and Occupations (Title 33)
Short Title:MARK A. DORR v. THE WYOMING BOARD OF CERTIFIED PUBLIC ACCOUNTANTS
Full Title:MARK A. DORR, Appellant (Petitioner), v. THE WYOMING BOARD OF CERTIFIED PUBLIC ACCOUNTANTS, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMark A. DorrGreg L. Goddard
AppelleeBoard of Certified Public AccountantsPatrick J. Crank
Michael L. Hubbard
Kennard F. Nelson
Douglas W. Weaver

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/10/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/10/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/10/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/10/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/24/2006Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/06/2006Brief - Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
04/14/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/24/2006Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
04/24/2006Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
04/24/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/02/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, six volumes. Volumes I & II, original papers; Volumes III & IV, transcripts; Volume V, agency record (volumes 1 thru 13); Volume VI, confidential exhibits (volumes 14 thru 18).RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/02/2006Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/16/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
06/27/2006Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Greg L. Goddard for appellant; Douglas W. Weaver, Special Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/27/2006Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
11/09/2006Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/30/2006Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/30/2006Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/30/2006Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/30/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/04/2006Service - Certified mail signature return cards (3)ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal