Case: 14-06-00832-CR
14-06-00832-CR
09/22/2006
Aggravated Robbery
Perry Rosland Smith
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
08/16/2007 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | State | |
06/14/2007 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant | |
06/07/2007 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant | |
05/18/2007 | Brief returned for non-compliance with T.R.A.P. | | |
05/17/2007 | Brief received - oral argument requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/18/2008 | Case stored | | |||
01/18/2008 | Mandate issued | | |||
01/14/2008 | Mandate due to be issued | | |||
12/20/2007 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |||
12/05/2007 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||
11/20/2007 | Memorandum opinion issued | AFFIRMED |
| ||
10/23/2007 | Submitted | | |||
09/06/2007 | Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied | | |||
08/16/2007 | Case ready to be set | | |||
08/16/2007 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||
08/15/2007 | State brief due | | |||
07/26/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED | | ||
07/17/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
07/16/2007 | State brief due | | |||
06/14/2007 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||
06/14/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Extension of time to file GRANTED and document received is ordered filed | | ||
06/14/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | DENIED AS MOOT | | ||
06/07/2007 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||
06/07/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
05/18/2007 | Brief returned for non-compliance with T.R.A.P. | | |||
05/17/2007 | Brief received - oral argument requested | | |||
05/17/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
05/15/2007 | Appellants brief due | | |||
04/19/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED | | ||
04/16/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
04/16/2007 | Appellants brief due | | |||
03/22/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED | | ||
03/16/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
03/15/2007 | Appellants brief due | | |||
02/13/2007 | Reporters record filed | | |||
02/12/2007 | Reporters record due | | |||
01/22/2007 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | GRANTED | | ||
01/19/2007 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||
01/18/2007 | Reporters record due | | |||
12/19/2006 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | GRANTED | | ||
12/18/2006 | Reporters record due | | |||
12/18/2006 | Record due | | |||
12/08/2006 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||
12/07/2006 | Clerks record filed | | |||
10/31/2006 | Docketing Statement FILED | | |||
09/26/2006 | Court reporters information sheet sent | | |||
09/26/2006 | Clerks Certification Letter Sent | | |||
09/22/2006 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||
09/15/2006 | Motion for new trial FILED | | |||
08/18/2006 | Notice of Appeal FILED - APP | | |||
08/18/2006 | Date of Sentence | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/18/2008 | Retention | Criminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Smith, Perry Rosland | Criminal - Appellant | Lynette K. Briggs |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | B. Warren Goodson, Jr. |
Trial Court Information
122nd District Court
Galveston
Honorable John A. Ellisor
05CR0466
50 Years TDCJ