judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LORENZO D. PLATER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0855
Short Caption:LORENZO D. PLATER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-735-09Filed Date:07/08/2010

Opening Event Date:07/08/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:10/04/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/18/2011
Argued/Submitted:10/11/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/04/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLorenzo D. Plater YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/08/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/27/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Matthew C. Leefer, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
08/04/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
10/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (121 pgs/Maar) 4/7/10 proc.
10/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (186 pgs/Rogers) 4/12/10 proc.
10/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (88 pgs/Maddox) 4/13/10 proc. cd attached
10/04/2010RECORD INDEX
10/04/2010RECORD COPIES
10/04/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/07/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
10/08/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (SEALED documents)
11/08/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until January 30, 2011 (no oppo)
11/12/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before January 30, 2011. (JAC)
01/31/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
01/31/2011APPENDIX
02/23/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 3/2/11. no oppo
03/07/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before April 18, 2011. (JAC)
04/18/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
04/18/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/29/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
09/01/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/11/2011FiledSubmitted To Thompson,Reid,Nebeker
10/13/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Thompson, Associate Judge, Reid, Associate Judge, Retired, and Newman, Senior Judge.)
11/04/2011FiledMandate
11/16/2011FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)