judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SPEIGHT, McCUE & ASSOCIATES, P.C. v. FRENCH CARTER WALLOP and SCOTT M. GOODWYN

Case Heading (06-142)
Case Number:06-142Case Docketed On:06/22/2006
Linked To: 06-143
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Courts (Title 5)
Short Title:SPEIGHT, McCUE & ASSOCIATES, P.C. v. FRENCH CARTER WALLOP and SCOTT M. GOODWYN
Full Title:SPEIGHT, McCUE & ASSOCIATES, P.C. Appellant (Respondent), v. FRENCH CARTER WALLOP and SCOTT M. GOODWYN, Appellees (Petitioners).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSpeight, McCue & Associates, P.C.William Mather McKellar
AppelleeFrench Carter WallopDaniel Barry Frank
AppelleeScott M. GoodwynDaniel Barry Frank

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 36
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/22/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/22/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/22/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/22/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/31/2006Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/15/2006Brief - AppelleesBriefAppelleeFinal
09/29/2006Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
10/09/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/13/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcript; Volume III, Agency RecordRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/13/2006Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/27/2006Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
10/27/2006Order - Assignment of judge Nena James and recusing Justice BurkeOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
10/27/2006Order - Assignment of judge David Park and recusing Justice KiteOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
10/27/2006Order - Assignment of judge John Brooks and recusing Justice GoldenOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
10/27/2006Order - Assignment of judge Jeffrey Donnell and recusing Justice HillOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
03/05/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Judge Donnell writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/21/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/21/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/21/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal