judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SAM (GINGER) VS. STATE C/W 34754

Case Information: 34755
Short Caption:SAM (GINGER) VS. STATE C/W 34754Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 34754 *, 34755Related Case(s): 34411
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR970660Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/31/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/31/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08185
09/15/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Notice of entry of 3/18/99 judgment. Due Date: 10 days
09/21/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order or judgment appealed from filed in district court on: March 18, 1999. 99-08955
09/30/1999Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney David Otto shall file the transcript request form within10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. 99-09371
04/03/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Fast Track. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. 00-05343
05/31/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Recalling Remittitur and Reinstating Appeal. On December 21, 1999, the State filed a motion to dismiss Docket No. 34754, arguing that the notice of appeal was untimely. This court dismissed the appeal on February 25, 2000. Remittitur issued on March 22, 2000. Upon reconsideration, we have concluded that the appeal should not have been dismissed. We recall the remittitur and reinstate Docket No. 34754. We conclude that these appeals should be consolidated. Counsel for appellant filed a fast track statement in Docket No. 34754 on December 15, 1999. In light of this order consolidating these appeals, counsel for appellant may file an amended fast track statement within 15 days of this order, if counsel deems such an amendment necessary to address any issues in Docket No. 34755. Respondent shall file a single fast track response addressing both appeals within 35 days of this order. Nos. 34754, 34755.
08/09/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On May 31, 2000, this court entered an order directing respondent to file a fast track response in these appeals within 35 days. To date no fast track response has been filed. Counsel for respondent shall file and serve the fast track response within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel for respondent should not be sanctioned. Nos. 34754, 34755. Document No. 00-13855.
08/18/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. (Nos. 34754 and 34755).
08/18/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. (Nos. 34754 and 34755).
09/13/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER these appeals dismissed." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML Nos. 34754, 34755. 01-05001
10/10/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-16524
10/10/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/25/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 18, 2000. 00-16524