Case: 14-07-00810-CR
14-07-00810-CR
09/26/2007
Manslaughter
Jon Benoit Guilbeau
The State of Texas
No
1st Court of Appeals
01/17/2008
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
02/15/2008 | Appellants brief due | | |
02/15/2008 | Reporters record due | | |
01/17/2008 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | GRANTED | |
01/17/2008 | Order entered | | |
01/15/2008 | Reporters record filed | | |
01/14/2008 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | GRANTED | |
01/11/2008 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |
01/11/2008 | Reporters record due | | |
01/11/2008 | Record due | | |
01/08/2008 | Clerks record filed | | |
11/02/2007 | Record due | | |
10/08/2007 | Fax received | | |
10/05/2007 | Trial court clerks certification of record requested | | |
10/03/2007 | Letter filed | | |
10/03/2007 | Trial court clerks certification of record requested | | |
10/03/2007 | Court reporters information sheet sent | | |
09/27/2007 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |
09/26/2007 | Case began in court of appeals | | |
09/21/2007 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |
09/14/2007 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/17/2008 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Guilbeau, Jon Benoit | Criminal - Appellant | Patrick F. McCann |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | William J. Delmore III |
Trial Court Information
228th District Court
Harris
Honorable Robert D. Jones
975831
20yrs TDCJ & $10,000 fine