judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHRISTOPHER RADER v. SUGARLAND ENTERPRISES, INC., a Wyoming corporation, d/b/a Holiday Inn

Case Heading (06-20)
Case Number:06-20Case Docketed On:01/30/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury
Short Title:CHRISTOPHER RADER v. SUGARLAND ENTERPRISES, INC., a Wyoming corporation, d/b/a Holiday Inn
Full Title:CHRISTOPHER RADER, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. SUGARLAND ENTERPRISES, INC., a Wyoming corporation, d/b/a Holiday Inn, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantChristopher RaderJ. Douglas McCalla
Tyson Elliot Logan
AppelleeSugarland Enterprises, Inc.Timothy W. Miller

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2006 WY 160
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/30/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/30/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/30/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/30/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/15/2006Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
03/17/2006Brief - Appellant; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppellantFinal
05/03/2006Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/19/2006Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
05/19/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/23/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, one volume. Volume I, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/23/2006Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/21/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/02/2006Order - Assignment of judge. Filed order recusing Justice Kite. Assigned District Judge John C. Brooks to act in this matter.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
09/13/2006Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Voigt, Justices Golden, Hill and Burke, and Brooks, DJ (Tyson E. Logan for appellant; Timothy W. Miller for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
09/13/2006Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/28/2006Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. District Judge John C. Brooks writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/16/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/16/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/16/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/16/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/17/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal