Case: 01-09-01039-CV
01-09-01039-CV
11/30/2009
Contract
Leisha Rojas
Robert Scharnberg
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/17/2011 | Reply brief filed | Appellant | |
03/01/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee | |
03/31/2010 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
06/10/2011 | Mandate issued | | |||||
04/01/2011 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||||
03/17/2011 | Reply brief filed | | |||||
03/17/2011 | Memorandum opinion issued | Reverse TC judgment and remand case to TC for further proceedings |
| ||||
03/17/2011 | Judgment Issued | | |||||
03/15/2011 | Reply brief due | | |||||
03/01/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||||
03/01/2011 | Appellees brief due | | |||||
02/23/2011 | Submitted | | |||||
02/16/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion in part and deny motion in part | | ||||
02/16/2011 | Motion to reset oral argument disposed | Grant motion in part and deny motion in part | | ||||
02/16/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
02/16/2011 | Fee paid | | |||||
02/16/2011 | Motion to substitute attorney disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
02/16/2011 | Motion to reset oral argument filed | | |||||
02/16/2011 | Motion to substitute attorney filed | | |||||
02/02/2011 | Motion to withdraw attorney disposed | Deny motion | | ||||
02/02/2011 | Set for submission on oral argument | | |||||
01/27/2011 | Fee paid | | |||||
01/27/2011 | Motion to withdraw attorney filed | | |||||
01/26/2011 | Motion disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
01/24/2011 | Fee paid | | |||||
01/24/2011 | Motion filed | | |||||
09/24/2010 | Letter issued by the court | | |||||
09/21/2010 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
09/21/2010 | Letter received | | |||||
09/21/2010 | Letter issued by the court | | |||||
06/08/2010 | Response due | | |||||
05/19/2010 | Notice of late brief | | |||||
04/30/2010 | Appellees brief due | | |||||
03/31/2010 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||||
03/29/2010 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
03/11/2010 | Affidavit filed | | |||||
02/25/2010 | Record checked in | | |||||
02/25/2010 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
02/23/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
02/16/2010 | Fee paid | | |||||
02/16/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
02/16/2010 | Appearance of counsel | | |||||
02/16/2010 | Record checked out | | |||||
02/03/2010 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||
02/01/2010 | Document filed | | |||||
01/26/2010 | Clerks record filed | | |||||
01/22/2010 | Record due | | |||||
12/30/2009 | Reporters record filed | | |||||
12/28/2009 | Fee paid | | |||||
12/24/2009 | Court fee due | | |||||
12/24/2009 | Docketing statement due | | |||||
11/30/2009 | Notice of appeal received | | |||||
11/30/2009 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||
11/23/2009 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
10/19/2009 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||
09/24/2009 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/10/2017 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Rojas, Leisha | Appellant | Keith Alexander Gross Walter J. Kronzer III Sean Michael Reagan |
Scharnberg, Robert | Appellee | Perry Richard Stevens |
Trial Court Information
300th District Court
Brazoria
Honorable K. Randal Hufstetler
6824