judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTONIO PEOPLES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0834
Short Caption:ANTONIO PEOPLES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead: 10-CF-0737 Consolidated:10-CF-0834
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-19021-09Filed Date:07/06/2010

Opening Event Date:07/06/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/16/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/14/2011
Argued/Submitted:09/21/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/04/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAntonio Peoples Y
Dennis M. HartYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/06/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/27/2010ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 10-CF-737 and 10-CF-834 are consolidated for all purposes herein. F/O that Dennis Hart, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant Antonio Peoples in appeal no. 10-CF-834. F/O that counsel for appellant in appeal no. 10-CF-834, shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of the order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant mustadvise the Court Reporting and recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
07/27/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Dennis Hart, Esquire
08/26/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (10CF834) (RT ordered/needed (pi)
08/30/2010RECEIVED- aplt's brief and appendix (Daniels)
09/16/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (82 pgs/Pirfo) 3/29/10 proc.
09/16/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (199 pgs/Johnson) 3/30/10 proc.
09/16/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (80 pgs/Ransom-Jones) 3/31/10 proc.
09/16/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/20/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (pretrial servs report-- filed 9/2/09) ***SEALED***
09/20/2010RECORD COPIES (10-CF-737)
09/20/2010RECORD INDEX (10-CF-737)
09/28/2010 It appearing that the complete records on appeal have been filed with this corut, and the lodged brief and limited appendix of Willis M. Danields, it is ORDERED that the lodged brief and limited appendix of appellant Willis M. Daniels is filed. It is F/O that appellant Antonio Peoples' brief andthe limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's consolidated brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
09/28/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF - Willis M. Daniels
09/28/2010APPENDIX - Willis M. Daniels
10/25/2010RECORD COPIES (10-CF-834)
10/25/2010RECORD INDEX (10-CF-834)
10/25/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (pretrial servs report-- SEALED)
11/10/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF no oppo
11/10/2010RECEIVED - aplt's brief w/appdx
11/17/2010 On consideration of appellant Antonio Peoples'consent motion for leave to late file the lodged brief and limited appendix, it is ORDERED that appellant Peoples' motion is granted and the lodged brief and limited appendixt are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the consolidated brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (Castillo)
11/17/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF - Peoples
11/17/2010 LIMITED APPENDIX - Peoples
12/15/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until February 14, 2011 (unopposed)
12/21/2010 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before February 14, 2011. (JAC)
01/20/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (8 pgs/tape) 6/3/10 proc. w/cd
02/14/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
02/14/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
02/14/2011APPENDIX
02/25/2011FiledFinal Screening-Regular
04/14/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of June 2011 through Sept 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by APR. 22, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
04/19/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aple
07/27/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/21/2011FiledArgued before Judges Fisher, Reid, Steadman Dennis M. Hart, Esq. for appellant Warren Gorman, Esq. for appellant Adam Schwartz, Esq. for appellee
10/13/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher, Associate Judge, Reid, Associate Judge, Retired, and Steadman, Senior Judge.)
10/28/2011FiledMotion to publish (Appellee)
11/04/2011FiledMandate
11/23/2011FiledOrder Granting aple's motion to publish.
12/08/2011FiledOrder - (OPINION) MOJ published as an Opinion