judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-53
A-53
02/05/1944
Application for Writ of Error
G. C. LOCKLEY
OSCAR PAGE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/20/1944Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
02/23/1944Supplement to ResponseRespondent
02/11/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
02/05/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/29/1944Letter Filed
03/20/1944Brief on the Merits
02/23/1944Supplement to Response
02/21/1944Bond
02/16/1944Document received (See Remarks)
02/11/1944Response to Petition
02/05/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/05/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Oscar PageRespondent
G. C. LockleyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information