judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SLAYDEN (EMERY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34605
Short Caption:SLAYDEN (EMERY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34216 , 44692
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C149285Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/17/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/02/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/02/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for Appellant). 99-07073
08/09/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-07327
08/11/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 8/19/98; 3/25/99; 4/14/99; 6/22/99. Court Reporter: Yvonne M. Valentin. 99-07419
08/16/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 3/25/98, 8/19/98, 4/7/99, 4/14/99, 4/19/99, 4/20/99, 4/21/99, 4/28/99, 6/22/99. To Court Reporters: Yvonne Valentin, Kris Johnson. 99-07567
10/18/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk of this court shall administratively close Docket No. 34216. The clerk shall transfer to Docket No. 34605 all documents filed or received in Docket No. 34216. Appellant's appeal from the judgment of conviction shall proceed in Docket No. 34605. SNP. Nos. 34216, 34605. Document No. 99-10041. 99-10041
10/18/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. 10/18/99 Order: transferred from Docket No. 34216 to Docket No. 34605. (Notice of appeal filed in 34216 on 5/17/99) 99-04030
11/02/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Reporter Valentin has failed to file transcripts for the proceedings held on April 19, 1999, April 20, 1999, and April 21, 1999. Reporter Johnson has failed to file transcripts of the proceedings conducted on April 7, 1999, and April 28, 1999. Court reporters Valentin and Johnson shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve the requested transcripts or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. 99-10692
11/22/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. April 19, 1999 and April 20, 1999 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Yvonne Valentin. 99-11634
11/23/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-11696
11/24/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Brief and appendix due: 90 days from the date of this order. We do not expect further requests for extensions of time absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 99-11764
12/10/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: April 19, 1999 at 9:00 o'clock a.m. Court Reporter: Yvonne M. Valentin. 99-12449
02/24/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Court reporters Valentin and Johnson shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve the requested stranscripts or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Failure to comply with this order may result in the immediate imposition of sanctions, including, but not limited to, monetary sanctions. Court reporter Velentin: proceedings held on April 21, 1999. Court reporter Johnson: proceedings held on April 7, 1999, and April 28, 1999. 00-02947
03/09/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. from court reporter Yvonne Valentin 00-03699
03/27/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-04862
04/14/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We direct appellant to include any relevant portions of the April 21, 1999, transcript in the appendix to appellant's opening brief. We vacate that portion of our order of Februrary 24, 2000, directing court reporter Yvonne Valentin to file and serve the April 21, 1999, transcript. To date, court reporter Kris Johnson has not complied with our orders entered November 2, 1999, and February 24, 2000, or otherwise communicated with this court. Accordingly, we conclude that the imposition of sanctions is warranted. Court reporter Johnson shall, within 20 days of the date of this order, personally pay the sum of $100.00 to the Supreme Court Law Library and file proof of such payment with this court. Further, court reporter Johnson shall within 20 days of the date of this order file and serve the April 7, 1999, and April 28, 1999, transcripts. We caution court reporter Johnson that failure to comply with this order may result in additional sanctions. We grant appellant's March 27, 2000, motion for extension of time to file the opening brief. Appellant shall have until May 5, 2000, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 30(a)(1). 00-06030
04/17/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: April 7, 1999, and April 28, 1999. Court Reporter: Kris Johnson. (Mailed on: 4/13/00) 00-06088
04/19/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Supreme Court Order filed April 14, 2000. 00-06240
05/26/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Court reporter Johnson shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file with this cout proof of payment of the sanction imposed on April 14, 2000. Appellant shall within 10 days from the date of this order file and serve the opening brief and appendix or a motion for an extension of time or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against appellant's counsel. 00-08918
06/06/2000Other Other. Received check in the amount of $100 from Court Reporter Kris Johnson as payment of sanctions per order filed 5/26/00. (Forwarded to Supreme Court Law Library.)
06/06/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 4/7/99, 4/28/99 (2). Court Reporter: Kris Johnson. 00-09548
06/20/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Application for Extension of Time and Response to Order to Show Cause filed on May 26, 2000. 00-10527
06/20/2000MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File Ninety-Four Page Opening Brief. 00-10529
07/25/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On June 20, 2000, appellant's counsel filed: (1) a combined response to our order of May 26, 2000, and motion for extension of time to file the opening brief and appendix; and (2) a motion for leave to file a brief in excess of thirty pages. We grant the unopposed motions. The clerk of this court shall forthwith file the 94-page opening brief and the appendix submitted on June 20, 2000. Further, having reviewed counsel's response, we conclude that the imposition of sanctions is not warranted. Respondent shall have thirty (30) days from the date of this order within which to file and serve the answering brief. 00-12898
07/25/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. 00-10530
07/25/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1 through 8. 00-10532
08/18/2000MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: September 25, 2000. 00-14458
09/26/2000MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 47 pages. 00-16951
09/26/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express - no postmark. 00-16953
10/19/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: November 27, 2000. 00-18527
11/27/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Forty day extension request. 00-20620
12/04/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The motion filed November 27, 2000, is granted. Appellant's reply brief shall be served and filed on or before January 4, 2001. 00-21071
01/08/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-00337
01/29/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve a supplemental opening brief. Respondent shall have 30 days from the filing of the supplemental opening brief to file and serve a supplemental answering brief. Appellant shall have 30 days from service of the supplemental answering brief to file a single reply brief in response to answering brief and supplemental answering brief. 01-01833
01/29/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve a supplemental opening biref. Respondent shall have 30 days from the filing of the supplemental opening brief to file and serve a supplemental answering brief. Appellant shall have 30 days from service of the supplemental answering brief to file a single reply brief in response to the answering brief and supplemental answering brief. 01-01873
03/05/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Appellant's Supplemental Opening Brief. Mailed on: 3/2/01. 01-03999
04/04/2001BriefFiled Supplemental Brief. Respondent's Supplemental Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 01-05737
05/03/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-07471
05/07/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed May 3, 2001. Appellant's reply brief shall be served and filed on or before June 4, 2001. 01-07538
06/12/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-09794
06/15/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed June 12, 2001. Appellant shall have to and including July 17, 2001, to file and serve the reply brief. We caution counsel that failure to demonstrate extreme and unforeseeable circumstances for additional requests for extension of time may result in the denial of the motion. 01-10053
07/31/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-12904
08/02/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed July 31, 2001. We conclude that appellant has not demonstrated extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. Nevertheless, in the interest of judicial economy, we grant appellant's motion. The clerk shall file the reply brief received on July 26, 2001. 01-13118
08/02/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 01-12704
01/17/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 02-01181
01/17/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP02-CY/DA/ML
03/13/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-04518
04/09/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-04643
04/09/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/23/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 11, 2002. 02-04643