judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JULIUS DONTE BROWN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0054)
Case Number:S-07-0054Case Docketed On:03/07/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:JULIUS DONTE BROWN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JULIUS DONTE BROWN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJulius Donte BrownDiane M. Lozano
Ryan R. Roden
Tina N. Olson
Donna D. Domonkos
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/07/2007Event - Docketed and indexed.EventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/07/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court.Notice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/07/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter.Notice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/24/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/24/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/05/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/06/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/19/2007Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
07/19/2007Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
07/19/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal