judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHAEL H. HAYNIE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 79-CF-1062
Short Caption:MICHAEL H. HAYNIE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:2483-79Filed Date:10/05/1979

Opening Event Date:10/05/1979Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/01/1980Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/20/1984
Argued/Submitted:04/10/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMichael H. Haynie N
James W. KleinNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Robert H. Klonoff YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HAYNIE, MICHAEL H. UNITED STATES
10/05/1979FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/01/1980FiledRecord Completed
01/20/1984FiledBriefing Completed
04/10/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/24/1985FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition