judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BURTON (JERRY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34736
Short Caption:BURTON (JERRY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Esmeralda Co. - Fifth Judicial District - 627Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/22/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/26/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/26/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08018
08/26/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 12, 1999. Court Reporter: Jeanie Wright. 99-08019
09/22/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Certified copy of final order due: 30 days. Certified copy of ROA due: 120 days. ROA must include any previously prepared transcripts; ROA shall not include exhibits. The record shall also contain a transcript of the evidentiary hearing held on July 12, 1999. If the transcript has not been preparred, this court directts the district court to order preparation of the transcript. 99-09023
12/22/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. (Record includes judgment requested by order entered on September 22, 1999.ah) 99-13024
12/22/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/18/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court." fn2[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 01-01121
02/13/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-01202
02/13/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/01/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 16, 2001. 01-01202