Case: 01-06-00958-CV
01-06-00958-CV
10/19/2006
Summary judgment
Paddy Argovitz
Jerry Argovitz
No
14th Court of Appeals
03/05/2007
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/09/2007 | Record checked in | | |
03/05/2007 | Motion to transfer disposed | Grant motion | |
03/05/2007 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Grant motion | |
02/12/2007 | Letter filed | | |
02/11/2007 | Appellants brief due | | |
02/09/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |
01/26/2007 | Record checked out | | |
01/26/2007 | Record checked in | | |
01/25/2007 | Record checked out | | |
01/23/2007 | Clerks record filed | | |
01/08/2007 | No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record | | |
01/04/2007 | Response filed | | |
01/04/2007 | Letter filed | | |
01/04/2007 | No clerks record filed in civil case | | |
12/15/2006 | Record checked in | | |
12/14/2006 | Response filed | | |
12/14/2006 | Motion to transfer filed | | |
12/07/2006 | Record checked out | | |
12/05/2006 | Supplemental clerks record filed | | |
11/23/2006 | Motion filed | | |
11/17/2006 | Docketing statement filed | | |
11/14/2006 | Letter issued by court | | |
11/13/2006 | Docketing statement filed | | |
11/09/2006 | Filing fee due per our notice/order. | | |
11/04/2006 | Docket Statement Due per our Docketing Order | | |
11/03/2006 | Letter filed | | |
10/22/2006 | Record due 10 days after notice of appeal filed; accelerated appeal (TRAP 26.1(b), 35.1(b)) | | |
10/19/2006 | NOA received in COA from trial court. | | |
10/12/2006 | Notice of appeal filed | | |
09/19/2006 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/05/2007 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Argovitz, Jerry | Appellee | Thomas Clark Wright Thomas R. Conner Julia Leigh Kurtz Dean |
Argovitz, Paddy | Appellant | Dale Ossip Johnson |
Trial Court Information
309th District Court
Harris
Honorable Hon. Frank B. Rynd
0505236