judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTHONY D. HOLLIS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0167
Short Caption:ANTHONY D. HOLLIS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F747-86Filed Date:02/17/1987

Opening Event Date:02/17/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/12/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAnthony D. Hollis N
Nancy R. Beiter NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HOLLIS, ANTHONY D. UNITED STATES
02/17/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/31/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) NANCY R. BEITER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/07/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 041087 SCHPRD DSA
04/14/1987RECORD ON APPEAL GG PANEL SCDATE 042087 SCHPRD R
06/28/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (242 PGS - WHALEN) GT PANEL SCDATE 061888 SCHPRD RT
07/06/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/08/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 30 DAY EXTENSION (NO OPPO) RJG PB PANEL SCDATE 080888 SCHPRD BA
09/09/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 090788 SCHPRD BA
09/09/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE STATEMENT OF APPELLANT FOR 30 DAYS JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/29/1988ORDER CNSL FOR APLT W/I 30 DAYS TO FILE STMT IN ACCORD. WITH JOHNSON V. US SL PANELPY SCDATE 091588 SCHPRD N
10/28/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 103188 SCHPRD ANSA
11/04/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF NANCY R. BEITER AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/21/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
11/21/1988ORDER APPEAL DISMISSED. PB PANELRO SCDATE 110388 SCHPRD N
11/21/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
12/12/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD