judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LAWRENCE E. GREENE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1114
Short Caption:LAWRENCE E. GREENE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F12331-88Filed Date:07/10/1989

Opening Event Date:07/10/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/20/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/19/1990
Argued/Submitted:03/13/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/12/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLawrence E. Greene N
George Jack King YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
James A. Meade YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GREENE, LAWRENCE E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 7/19/90 ORD: GRANT APLE'S MO NOTE - 01 TO EXT TM TO FL BRF & CLK TO NOTE - 02 FL LODGED BE; F/O THAT THIS NOTE - 02 CASE TO BE SCHD FOR CONSID BY NOTE - 03 A MERITS DIV OF THIS CRT AS NOTE - 03 SOON AS THE CAL PERMITS.
07/10/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/20/1989FiledRecord Completed
09/20/1989RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/03/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) GEORGE J. KING, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 100989 SCHPRD CHECK
10/11/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/11/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 101389 SCHPRD DSA
10/12/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER RECORD IS COMPLETE AD PANEL SCDATE 112089 SCHPRD BA
11/16/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR; APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 102389 SCHPRD U
04/03/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (170 PGS. -- SHELTON) RJG PANEL SCDATE 122389 SCHPRD RT
04/04/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/11/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF PF PANEL SCDATE 051490 SCHPRD BA
06/15/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 12, 1990 RJG PANEL SCDATE 061590 SCHPRD BE
07/09/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/19/1990FiledBriefing Completed
07/19/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/19/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 THUR 03 GW PANELRBH SCDATE 070390 SCHPRD V
08/02/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF APLT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/13/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/13/1991SUBMITTED PANELBESCWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/22/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELBESCWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/22/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/12/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD